EP2590052 - Voltage scaling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Singapore Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Fusionopolis Walk No.03-01 Solaris Singapore 138628 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states MediaTek Singapore Pte Ltd. No. 1 Fusionopolis Walk No.03-01 Solaris, Singapore / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satyamoorthy, Anand 345 Highland Ave, Apt. 3 Somerville, MA / US | 02 /
Fitzpatrick, Sean 131 Virginia Farme Ln Carlisle, MA / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007367.1 | 26.10.2012 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | US201161555808P | 04.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555808 P | US201213474719 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: US201213474719 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2590052 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2590052 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
G06F1/3296 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spannungsskalierungssystem | [2013/19] | English: | Voltage scaling system | [2013/19] | French: | Système d'ajustement de tension | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005283630 (SHIKATA TAKASHI [JP]) [I] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065]; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2006073845 (ATHEROS COMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2010188115 (VON KAENEL VINCENT R [US]) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075]; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US2011068858 (CHAWLA NITIN [IN], et al) [A] 1,12* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 *; | [T] - "System Management Mode 1 System Management Mode", (20131006), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org, (20131121), XP055089568 |