EP2568634 - Radio transmitting apparatus, radio receiving apparatus, and radio transmission method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states III Holdings 11, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sudo, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2013/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007489.3 | 25.11.2002 | [2013/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010359964 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001359964 | JP20020031243 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002031243 | JP20020115537 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002115537 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2568634 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2568634 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04J13/00, H04B1/7083 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04J11/003 (EP,US);
H04J13/0003 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/11] | Title | German: | Funkübertragungsvorrichtung, Funkempfangsvorrichtung und Funkempfangsverfahren | [2013/11] | English: | Radio transmitting apparatus, radio receiving apparatus, and radio transmission method | [2013/11] | French: | Appareil de transmission radio, appareil de réception radio et procédé de transmission radio | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02783607.1 / EP1370018 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020783607) is 04.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1069725 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045]; figure 8; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP1033853 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001156744 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |