EP2556877 - AIR DRYER WITH PRE-FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/07] | Air dryer with pre-filter | ||
[2016/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Air Brake LLC 748 Starbuck Avenue Watertown, NY 13601 / US | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states New York Air Brake Corporation 748 Starbuck Avenue Watertown New York 13601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Eric 26156 County Rt. 16 Evans Mill, New York 13637 / US | 02 /
Kohar, Richard 650 Sussex Boulevard Kingston, Ontario K7M 5A8 / CA | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2013/07] | Application number, filing date | 12007539.5 | 08.02.2008 | [2013/07] | Priority number, date | US20070736253 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: US 736253 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2556877 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2556877 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2556877 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B01D53/22, B60T17/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/268 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B60T17/004 (EP,US);
B01D2313/18 (EP,US);
Y10S55/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2013/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTTROCKNER MIT VORFILTER | [2016/17] | English: | AIR DRYER WITH PRE-FILTER | [2016/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DESSICCATION D'AIR ÉQUIPÉ D'UN PRÉ-FILTRE | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/07] | Lufttrockner mit Vorfilter | ||
Former [2013/07] | Air dryer with pre-filter | ||
Former [2013/07] | Dispositif de dessiccation d'air équipé d'un pré-filtre | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 13.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08729430.2 / EP2134448 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080729430) is 27.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2008 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IE | 08.02.2017 | LU | 08.02.2017 | MT | 08.02.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.02.2008 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.02.2008 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 08.02.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3487932 (FORRESTER ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US3722187 (POTTER O, et al); | [A]US4909937 (HOFFMANN JUERGEN [DE], et al); | [A]EP1275432 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [A]WO2006034840 (DUERR DENTAL GMBH CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2007041559 (STANADYNE CORP, et al) | by applicant | US5375620 | US5525143 | US6719825 |