EP2662958 - Assembly consisting of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lampalzer, Markus Pilsener Strasse 4 90537 Feucht / DE | 02 /
Geissler, Josef Gratzmüllerstraße 7 86150 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Schreiner, Bernd Elsässerstraße 30 81667 München / DE | 04 /
Patla, Michael Blumenstraße 17 90762 Fürth / DE | 05 /
Vogel, Werner Hohenloher Strasse 48 91595 Burgoberbach / DE | [2018/21] |
Former [2013/46] | 01 /
Lampalzer, Markus Georg-Hoffmann-Straße 5a 90537 Feucht / DE | ||
02 /
Geissler, Josef Gratzmüllerstraße 7 86150 Augsburg / DE | |||
03 /
Schreiner, Bernd Elsässerstraße 30 81667 München / DE | |||
04 /
Patla, Michael Blumenstraße 17 90762 Fürth / DE | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007866.2 | 22.11.2012 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | DE20121003385 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012003385 | [2018/14] |
Former [2013/46] | DE20121003385 | 11.05.2012 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2662958 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2662958 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2662958 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/00, H02K7/108, F02N11/04, F02N15/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
F02N11/04 (EP,RU,US);
F02N11/00 (US);
F02N15/006 (EP,US);
H02K7/006 (EP);
H02K7/108 (EP);
Y10T74/134 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | H02K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | Anordnung bestehend aus einem Verbrennungsmotor | [2013/46] | English: | Assembly consisting of a combustion engine | [2013/46] | French: | Agencement composé d'un moteur à combustion | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 30.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2012 | AL | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | AT | 22.11.2021 | GB | 22.11.2021 | IE | 22.11.2021 | LU | 22.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
TR | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
AT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
AT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
AT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
AT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
AT | 22.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 02.06.2021 | |
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2782356 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,11-13 * figures 3, 6, 8, 10 * [Y] 15 [I] 5,7-10,14; | [Y]DE102007048443 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 15 * abstract ** figures 1-3 * | Examination | DE10250726 |