EP2597752 - Stacked lamination for rotors and/or stators of electric motors and generators, rotor with such a stacked lamination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/22] | Stacked lamination for rotors and/or stators of electric motors and generators, rotor with such a stacked lamination as well as manufacturing method of such a rotor and/or stator | ||
[2020/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kienle + Spiess GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 23 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Michael Dr. Panoramaweg 15 88400 Biberach / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Steffen Kelterweg 2 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | 03 /
Blocher, Daniel Kohlstattstrasse 3 86932 Pürgen / DE | 04 /
Bárdos, András Dr. Herzogstrasse 64 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Kohl, Karl-Heinz Jackisch-Kohl und Kohl Stuttgarter Straße 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/16] |
Former [2013/22] | Kohl, Karl-Heinz Stuttgarterstrasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007889.4 | 23.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | DE201110119922 | 28.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011119922 | [2013/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597752 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2597752 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597752 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/22, B22D19/00, H02K15/00, H02K1/17, H02K21/46, H02K1/27 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H02K1/17 (EP);
B22D19/0054 (EP);
H02K1/276 (EP);
H02K15/0012 (EP);
H02K21/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | H02K1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lamellenstapel für Rotoren und/oder Statoren von Elektromotoren und Generatoren, Rotor mit einem solchen Lamellenstapel | [2020/49] | English: | Stacked lamination for rotors and/or stators of electric motors and generators, rotor with such a stacked lamination | [2020/49] | French: | Empilement de tôles pour rotors et/ou stators de moteurs et générateurs électriques, rotor avec un tel empilement de tôles | [2020/49] |
Former [2013/22] | Lamellenstapel für Rotoren und/oder Statoren von Elektromotoren und Generatoren, Rotor mit einem solchen Lamellenstapel sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Rotors und/oder Stators | ||
Former [2013/22] | Stacked lamination for rotors and/or stators of electric motors and generators, rotor with such a stacked lamination as well as manufacturing method of such a rotor and/or stator | ||
Former [2013/22] | Empilement de tôles pour rotors et/ou stators de moteurs et générateurs électriques, rotor avec un tel empilement de tôles, ainsi que procédé de fabrication d'un tel rotor et/or stator | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05122877 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]DE10227859 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1,4,7,9,11,12 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPS61102157 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,4,9,11 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS61102155 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,4,9,11 * abstract *; | [Y]DE886337 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1,7,9,12 * page 2, lines 16-27; figures 1-6 * * page 1, lines 4-6 * | Examination | JPS57186966 |