EP2620350 - Method for steering a vehicle by means of a steering assistance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuberth, Stefan Scherzerstr. 2 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
Breu, Alexander Ringstr. 9 93495 Weiding / DE | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/31] | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG, Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 12008181.5 | 07.12.2012 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | DE20121001666 | 28.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012001666 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620350 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620350 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/00, B62D6/00, B62D15/02, B60W10/18, B60W10/20 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
B62D5/008 (EP,US);
B60W10/20 (US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B62D15/025 (EP,US);
B62D15/0285 (EP,US);
B62D6/001 (US);
B62D6/008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | B62D5/00, B62D6/00, B62D15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Lenken eines Fahrzeugs mittels eines Lenkassistenzsystems | [2013/31] | English: | Method for steering a vehicle by means of a steering assistance system | [2013/31] | French: | Procédé destiné à diriger un véhicule au moyen d'un système de direction assistée | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 21.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2012 | AL | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | |
NO | 04.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6082482 (KATO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6219603 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 5, lines 6-33; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE102004057262 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0016] , [0026] , [0027]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US2008091318 (DENG WEIWEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 69]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102007052258 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0019]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2011273310 (KADOWAKI JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016]; figure -; claim - * | Examination | US6070684 | JP2006103581 |