EP2607327 - A process for providing a semiconductor device using a thick-film composition containing antimony oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/26] | Thick-film composition containing antimony oxides and their use in the manufacture of semi-conductor devices | ||
[2018/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Heraeus Precious Metals GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörteis, Matthias Weidenweg 1d 63454 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Neidert, Michael Kapellenstrasse 3 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Immermannstraße 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12008393.6 | 17.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | EP20110010193 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11010193 | US201161579818P | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579818 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607327 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/02, C03C8/04, C03C8/18, C03C8/22, H01L31/0224, H01B1/16, H01B1/22 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
C03C8/02 (EP,US);
C03C8/04 (EP,US);
C03C8/08 (EP,US);
C03C8/16 (EP,US);
C03C8/18 (EP,US);
C03C8/22 (EP,US);
H01B1/14 (KR);
H01B1/16 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01L31/0224 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | C03C8/02, C03C8/04, C03C8/08, C03C8/18, C03C8/22, C03C8/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zum Herstellung einer Halbleiterbauelement unter Verwendung einer Dickfilmzusammensetzung mit Antimonoxid | [2018/50] | English: | A process for providing a semiconductor device using a thick-film composition containing antimony oxide | [2018/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif semi-conducteur utilisant une composition à film épais contenant de l'oxyde d'antimoine | [2018/51] |
Former [2013/26] | Dickfilmzusammensetzung mit Antimonoxid und ihre Verwendung bei der Herstellung von Halbleiterbauelementen | ||
Former [2013/26] | Thick-film composition containing antimony oxides and their use in the manufacture of semi-conductor devices | ||
Former [2013/26] | Composition à film épais contenant des oxydes antimoines et leur utilisation pour la fabrication de dispositifs semi-conducteurs | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006001009 (GARREAU-ILES ANGELIQUE GENEVIE [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] - [0019] - [0025] , [0030] , [0033] , [0042] , [0043] , [0054] , [0057]; claims 1-9; tables 1,2 * [I] 11-14; | [XI]US2009189126 (PRUNCHAK ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0010] , [0016] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0023] - [0005] - [0009] - [0012] - [0042] , [0044] , [0048] , [0050] , [0052] , [0057] , [0060]; claims 1,3,4,8,9,10,19,20 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]WO2010026952 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12 * paragraph [0055]; claims 1,2,5,9-11,13; table - *[I] 4,6,13,14; | [XI]US2011303883 (ISHIHARA KENTARO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0014] , [0018] , [0019] , [0 24] , [0030] , [0032] , [0040] , [0042] , [0049] , [0055] , [0056] - [0062] - [0076]; claims 1,2,6,7,12,14; tables 1-3 * [I] 4,5 |