EP2620641 - Method and apparatus for testing in field wind turbines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida. Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren / ES | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linares Fano, Miguel Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avda Ciudad de la Innovacion 9-11 31486 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | 02 /
Rodriguez Vazquez, Miguel Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avda Ciudad de la Innovacion 9-11 31486 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | 03 /
Marrero Sosa, Juan Alberto Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avda Ciudad de la Innovacion 9-11 31486 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 12008489.2 | 20.12.2012 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | ES20110001374 | 29.12.2011 Original published format: ES 201101374 | [2013/31] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620641 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, G01R31/34 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H02M5/40 (EP,US);
G01R31/34 (US);
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
H02M5/42 (ES);
G01R31/42 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen in Feldwindturbinen | [2013/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing in field wind turbines | [2013/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil de test des éoliennes sur le terrain | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |