EP2600240 - Predecode repair cache for instructions that cross an instruction cache line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Rodney Wayne 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Stempel, Brian Michael 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Mandzak, David John 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Dieffenderfer, James Norris 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Brinck, David John Borchardt, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12008657.4 | 31.10.2008 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | US20070934108 | 02.11.2007 Original published format: US 934108 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600240 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2600240 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F9/38 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
G06F9/30152 (EP,US);
G06F9/3816 (EP,US);
G06F9/382 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | Vordecodierungs-Reparatur-Cache für Anweisungen, die eine Anweisungs-Cache-Zeile kreuzen | [2013/23] | English: | Predecode repair cache for instructions that cross an instruction cache line | [2013/23] | French: | Cache de réparation de prédécodage pour des instructions qui croisent une ligne de cache d'instructions | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 11.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08843383.4 / EP2220555 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0498654 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * page 7, line 35 - page 9, line 23; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US6502185 (KELLER JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 47 - column 11, line 22 * * column 12, line 33 - line 36 * * column 22, line 54 - column 23, line 17; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2007016393 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * |