EP2612944 - Plunger for use in manufacturing glass containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEC Holding GmbH Messer-Platz 1 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muntner, Mike Castolin Eutectic Ireland Ltd. 36 Magna Avenue Magna Business Park, Citywest Dublin, 24 / IE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwalt Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 12150141.5 | 04.01.2012 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612944 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/22, C22C38/30, C22C38/32, C22C38/34, C22C38/36, C03B9/193, C03B9/48, C22C30/00, C23C4/06 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C03B9/1932 (EP,US);
C03B11/10 (US);
C03B9/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (US);
C22C38/18 (US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/30 (EP,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/36 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (US);
C22C38/52 (US);
C22C38/54 (US);
C23C2/04 (EP,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,US);
C23C24/103 (EP,US);
C23C24/106 (EP,US);
C23C4/06 (EP,US);
C23C4/067 (EP,US);
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
C03B2215/16 (US);
C22C1/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Presskolben für den Einsatz bei der Herstellung von Glasbehältern | [2013/28] | English: | Plunger for use in manufacturing glass containers | [2013/28] | French: | Piston à utiliser dans la fabrication des récipients en verre | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 25.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB867455 (METCO INC) [A] 5-15* page 4; tables 1,2 *; | [A]JPH01272738 (KUBOTA LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0377452 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4; claims 1-12 *; | [A]JPH11171562 (NIPPON YUTEKU KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]GB2464108 (LAPPING JOHN [GB]) [A] 1,5,15 * page 2 * | by applicant | US5120341 |