EP2439319 - Poly(ethyleneterephthalate) tire-cord, their preparation method and tire comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 1-23 Byeolyang-dong Kwacheon-city Kyungki-do 427-709 / KR | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeon, Ok-Hwa Hwangje Apt. 103 Geumrak2-ri Hayang-eup Gyeongsan-shi 712-903 Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Chung, Il 314 Cheonhyunsa 212 Gongdan-dong Goomi-shi 730-030 Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Gi-Woong 65-91 Beomeo-dong Suseong-gu 706-010 Daegu / KR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12150167.0 | 20.06.2008 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | KR20070060370 | 20.06.2007 Original published format: KR 20070060370 | KR20080029559 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080029559 | KR20080029558 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080029558 | US20080047517P | 24.04.2008 Original published format: US 47517 P | US20080047533P | 24.04.2008 Original published format: US 47533 P | US20080047480P | 24.04.2008 Original published format: US 47480 P | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/15] | KR20070060370 | 20.06.2007 | |
KR20080029559 | 31.03.2008 | ||
KR20080029558 | 31.03.2008 | ||
US20084751708P | 24.04.2008 | ||
US20084753308P | 24.04.2008 | ||
US20084748008P | 24.04.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439319 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439319 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/48, D01F6/62, B60C9/00 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B60C9/0042 (EP,US);
D02G3/48 (EP,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Polyethylentherephthalatreifencord, deren Herstellungsverfahren sowie damit hergestellter Reifen | [2012/15] | English: | Poly(ethyleneterephthalate) tire-cord, their preparation method and tire comprising the same | [2012/15] | French: | Câble pour pneus en poly(téréphtalate d'éthylène), leur procédé de préparation et pneu les comprenant | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08766486.8 / EP2171139 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5658665 (KIM KYEOGHYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * tables 1, 2 *; | [A]US2003047834 (OH DUK-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0025] * |