EP2447388 - Roll for use in galvanizing pot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamayoshi, Shigeyuki c/o Hitachi Metals Wakamatsu, Ltd. 9-1, Kitahama 1-chome, Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka-ken Fukuoka, 808-8558 / JP | 02 /
Nogami, Shingo c/o Hitachi Metals Wakamatsu, Ltd. 9-1, Kitahama 1-chome, Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka-ken Fukuoka, 808-8558 / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Shigetada c/o Hitachi Metals Wakamatsu, Ltd. 9-1, Kitahama 1-chome, Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka-ken Fukuoka, 808-8558 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/18] | Application number, filing date | 12151053.1 | 13.12.2004 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20030413529 | 11.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003413529 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447388 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447388 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/00, C04B35/584, F16C13/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
C04B35/593 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/00344 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/00 (EP,US);
F16C13/00 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/723 (EP,US);
C04B2235/767 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/788 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/18] | Title | German: | Rolle zur Verwendung in einem Verzinkungskessel | [2012/18] | English: | Roll for use in galvanizing pot | [2012/18] | French: | Rouleau pour une utilisation dans un creuset | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04806948.8 / EP1696047 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040806948) is 07.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.12.2014 | [2015/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE1011088 (COCKERILL SAMBRE SA [BE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 27; figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2001089837 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002161346 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-7* abstract * | by applicant | JPH05195178 | JP2001089836 | JP2001089837 | JP2001335368 | JP2003306752 |