EP2445196 - Focus control method and unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2017/50] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Shinya c/o Canon Kabushiki kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Limited European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12151498.8 | 23.06.2006 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050190505 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005190505 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2445196 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2445196 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2445196 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, G02B7/38, // H04N5/353 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G02B7/38 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N25/531 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (EP);
H04N23/675 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/44] |
Former [2012/17] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Fokussteuerverfahren und Einheit | [2012/17] | English: | Focus control method and unit | [2012/17] | French: | Procédé et unite de mise au point | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06780669.5 / EP1908277 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060780669) is 24.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | [2019/23] |
Former [2019/21] | GB | 23.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003063211 (WATANABE TOSHIMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004051029 (HIRAI SHINYA [JP]) | by applicant | JP2004140479 | JP2005190505 |