EP2449978 - Compound barb medical device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Matthew 37 Old Wood Road Berlin, CT Connecticut 06037 / US | 02 /
Maiorino, Nicholas 53 Avon Road Branford, CT Connecticut 06405 / US | 03 /
Kosa, Timothy D. 93 Hearn Lane Hamden, CT Connecticut 06514 / US | 04 /
Buchter, Mark S. 27 North Coe Lane Ansonia, CT Connecticut 06401 / US | 05 /
Primavera, Michael 433 Dogwood Road Orange, CT Connecticut 06477 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Lloyd, John Scott Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12151531.6 | 20.02.2009 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | US20080029964P | 20.02.2008 Original published format: US 29964 P | US20090361962 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: US 361962 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449978 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, // A61B17/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T29/49996 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | Medizinische Verbundvorrichtung mit Widerhaken und Verfahren | [2012/19] | English: | Compound barb medical device and method | [2012/19] | French: | Dispositif et procédé médical à crans composés | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2016 | 21.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/37] | 08.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09250460.4 / EP2092895 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090250460) is 08.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006116718 (LEIBOFF ARNOLD R [US]) [Y] 11* paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] *; | [X]US2007005110 (COLLIER JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1,4-10,14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] *; | [XY]WO2007133103 (SULAMANIDZE MARLEN ANDREEVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12,13 * figures 3,4; claim 5 * [Y] 11 | by applicant | US20060556002 | US20070899852 | US20070994173 |