EP2447779 - Method for preparation of lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inno, Toshifumi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Adachi, Keiichi c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12151733.8 | 16.01.2008 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20070008020 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007008020 | JP20070232773 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007232773 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447779 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/32, G03F7/031, G03F7/033 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/322 (EP);
G03F7/031 (EP);
G03F7/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lithographiedruckplatte | [2012/18] | English: | Method for preparation of lithographic printing plate | [2012/18] | French: | Procédé de préparation de plaque d'impression lithographique | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/19] | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08000794.1 / EP1947514 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1705522 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * abstract * * page 28, paragraphs 90,91,96 - page 31 * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0228] - paragraph [0230] * * paragraph [0309] * * paragraph [0329] - paragraph [0331] * * paragraph [0378] * * page 71, paragraph 420 - page 72, paragraph 426; examples 11,12; table 2 * * page 3, paragraph 16 * [Y] 2,3,5,9-12; | [Y]US2005266349 (VAN DAMME MARC [BE], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] , [0049] , [0051] , [0061] , [0062] , [0087] , [0097] , [0099] , [0170]; example 1 * * example -; claims 21,24,25 * * paragraph [0063] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2004013968 (TENG GARY GANGHUI [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0026] , [0030] , [0031] , [0036] , [0037]; example - *; | [AP]EP1793275 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0076] , [0303] * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0253] * * paragraph [0376] - paragraph [0377]; example - * * the whole document *; | [AP]EP1829681 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0108] , [0133] , [0245] , [0254] , [0255]; claim - * * paragraph [0225] - paragraph [0239] * | by applicant | JP2002365789 | US2004013968 | JPH03296759 | JPS5928329B | EP1349006 | WO2005029187 | JPS4537377B | JPS5829803 | JPS59152396 | JPS61151197 | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | EP1369232 | EP1369231 | EP1341040 | US2003124460 | EP1241002 | EP1288720 | US6027857 | US6171735 | US6420089 | JPH09236913 | JP2001277740 | JP2001277742 | US2800457 | US2800458 | US3287154 | JPS3819574B | JPH042446B | US3418250 | US3660304 | US3796669 | US3914511 | US4001140 | US4087376 | US4089802 | US4025445 | JPH0369163B | JPS519079B | GB930422 | US3111407 | GB952807 | GB967074 | JPS62170950 | JPS62226143 | JPS60168144 | JPS62293247 | US3458311 | JPS5549729B | EP0352630 | JPS5463902 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3280734 | US3902734 | JPS3622063B | US3276868 | US4153461 | US4689272 | JP2001199175 | JP2002079772 | JPH10282679 | JPH02304441 | JPH0721633B | JPH02220061 | JPS6059351 | US5148746 | US5568768 | GB2297719 | JPS58159533 | JPH03100554 | JPS62167253U | EP1072956 | JP2007008020 | JP2007232773 | - L-G. BROOKER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1951), vol. 73, pages 5326 - 5358 | - J. C. S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 1653 - 1660 | - J. C. S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 156 - 162 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1995), pages 202 - 232 | - NIPPON SECCHAKU KYOKAISHI, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | EP20030103499 | US19720292501 | US19700044563 |