EP2618598 - Management of multiple subscriber identity modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uros Technology S.à r.l. 45, avenue J.F. Kennedy 9053 Ettelbruck / LU | [2014/04] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Uros Technology S.à.r.l. 45, avenue J.F. Kennedy 90530 Ettelbruck / LU | ||
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Uros Oy Tutkijantie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokkonen, Jari c/o Uros Oy Tutkijantie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Nousiainen, Marko c/o Uros Oy Tutkijantie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | 03 /
Rahikainen, Ilkka c/o Uros Oy Tutkijantie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | 04 /
Uhari, Tommi c/o Uros Oy Tutkijantie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/30] | Pykälä, Timo Tapani Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12151906.0 | 20.01.2012 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618598 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, H04W48/18 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (US);
H04M2250/14 (US);
H04M2250/66 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwaltung mehrerer Teilnehmeridentitätsmodule | [2013/30] | English: | Management of multiple subscriber identity modules | [2013/30] | French: | Gestion de modules d'identité multiple d'abonné | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2018 | 11.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/10] | 27.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5987325 (TAYLOE DANIEL RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12,17,18 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 51 - line 60 * * column 4, line 39 - line 47 * * column 4, line 56 - line 62 * * column 5, line 31 - line 50 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2009186651 (YOU SUN MI [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-14,17,18 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE202010005832U (IMST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 1,2 * |