EP2452648 - System for selectable eccentric remodeling and/or ablation of atherosclerotic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vessix Vascular, Inc. 26052 Merit Circle, Suite 106 Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | [2016/06] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Vessix Vascular, Inc. 26052 Merit Circle, Suite 106 Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinke, Tom, A. P.O. Box 910326 San Diego, CA California 92191 / US | 02 /
Stone, Corbett, W. P.O. Box 910326 San Diego, CA California 92191 / US | 03 /
Ross, Stephen, O. P.O. Box 910326 San Diego, CA California 92191 / US | 04 /
Kelleher, Brian, S. P.O. Box 910326 San Diego, CA California 92191 / US | 05 /
Michel, Raphael, M. P.O. Box 910326 San Diego, CA California 92191 / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/06] |
Former [2013/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Clark, Jane Anne Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12151957.3 | 10.09.2004 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | US20030502515P | 12.09.2003 Original published format: US 502515 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452648 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2452648 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0041 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00601 (US);
A61B2018/00654 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,US);
A61B2090/373 (EP,US);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2012/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur auswählbaren exzentrischen Umformung bzw. Ablation von atherosklerotischem Material | [2012/20] | English: | System for selectable eccentric remodeling and/or ablation of atherosclerotic material | [2012/20] | French: | Système de remodelage et/ou de l'ablation excentrique sélectionnable de matériau athérosclérotique | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04816863.7 / EP1667595 | Divisional application(s) | EP16154519.9 / EP3045136 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040816863) is 22.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2016
24.02.2016
ADMISSIBLE Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l. / Medtronic Vascular Galway Unlimited Company 102, rue des Maraîchers / Parkmore Business Park West, Ballybrit 2124 Luxembourg / Galway, IE / LU Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter, et al, et al 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2016
24.02.2016
ADMISSIBLE Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l. / Medtronic Vascular Galway 102, rue des Maraîchers / Parkmore Business Park West, Ballybrit 2124 Luxembourg / Galway, IE / LU Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter, et al, et al 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | 19.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.04.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/02] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2004 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | LU | 10.09.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.09.2004 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
LU | 10.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
LU | 10.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 10.02.2016 | |
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5848969 (PANESCU DORIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,16-18 * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 31; figures 14,15,23,24 * * column 12, lines 57-59 * * column 14, lines 39-40 * [I] 9-11; | [XI]WO9900060 (ADVANCED CORONARY INTERVENTION [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,17 * page 25, lines 9-30; figures 7,12,14,20; claim 1 * * page 15, lines 22-31 * * page 10, lines 3-8 *[I] 9-11; | [XI]WO02087679 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12-15,17-19 * page 6, lines 9-11 * * page 13, line 27 - page 15, line 9; figures 8,10,18,20A-E * * page 27, lines 9-13; figures 1,6,6A,18,24 * * page 12, lines 5-12 * [I] 3,9-11,16; | [X]WO02089686 (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,10-19 * page 8, line 23 - page 14, line 3 * * page 28, lines 12-28 * * page 42, line 5 - page 43, line 17; figures 12,26 * * page 35, lines 19-22 * * page 21, lines 15-19 * * page 15, lines 5-7 * | Examination | US5722401 | US5755760 | WO0137723 | US6322559 | - Ru San Tan ET AL, "Power Versus Temperature-Controlled Ablation of Supraventricular Tachycardia", Asian Cardiovasc Thorac Ann, (20010101), vol. 9, pages 115 - 118, XP055051048 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/021849230100900211 | by applicant | US4682596 | US5098431 | US5454809 | US5749914 | US6582423 | - SLAGER ET AL., "Vapori-7ation ofAtherosclerotic Plaque by Spark Erosion", J. OF AMER. CARDIOL., (198506), pages 1382 - 6 | Opposition | US5279299 | US5454370 | US5487385 | WO9717892 | WO9812999 | US5882333 | US6004269 | WO0001313 | US6325797 | US6356790 | US2002139379 | WO02087679 | US2002165532 | WO02087676 | US6542781 | US6702811 | US6711444 | US2004167509 |