EP2618566 - Controlling controllable device during performance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FilmMe Group Oy Elektroniikkatie 5 90590 Oulu / FI | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koivukangas, Tapio c/o FilmMe Group Oy Elektroniikkatie 5 90590 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Salovaara, Lauri c/o FilmMe Group Oy Elektroniikkatie 5 90590 Oulu / FI | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/30] | Karppinen, Olavi Arto Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12152082.9 | 23.01.2012 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618566 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, G01S3/786, H04N5/232, G08B13/24 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G01S3/7864 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (EP,US);
H04N5/222 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
H04N7/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuerung einer steuerbaren Vorrichtung während der Nutzung | [2013/30] | English: | Controlling controllable device during performance | [2013/30] | French: | Contrôle de dispositif contrôlable durant la performance | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 11.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1499129 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0123] ** figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2008070687 (LYNX SYSTEM DEVELOPERS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,11-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * * page 0075 * * figures 1,2,8 * [I] 6,7; | [X]US2010245588 (WAEHNER GLENN C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * figures 1,2 * |