EP2484328 - Footboard with linen holder and transport shelf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hutchison, Stephen E 16 Hickory Lane Batesville, IN Indiana 47006 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12152620.6 | 26.01.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | US201161440477P | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161440477 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484328 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484328 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A61G7/0506 (EP,US);
A61G5/1094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fußbrett mit Wäschehalter und Transportablage | [2012/32] | English: | Footboard with linen holder and transport shelf | [2012/32] | French: | Pied de lit avec support de linge et étagère de transport | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0656183 (LECTUS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 28, lines 25-37; figures 45-52 *; | [AD]US5425148 (ASHCRAFT DAVID N [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 4, lines 42-51; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2008128571 (DOSTALER MELANIE [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0082]; figures 36-39 *; | [A]FR659792 (ANTON KRIESER) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 4-23; figures 1,5 * | by applicant | US4724555 | US5525148 |