EP2450615 - Lighting device with reverse tapered heatsink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van de Ven, Antony Paul D45 Marina Cove 380 Hiram's Highway Sai Kung Hong Kong / CN | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Adrian James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/04] |
Former [2014/02] | Bell, Mark Andrew, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Samuels, Adrian James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12152917.6 | 03.06.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | US20100794559 | 04.06.2010 Original published format: US 794559 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450615 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2450615 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21K99/00, // F21Y101/02 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
F21K9/232 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/78 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/74 (EP,US);
F21V29/51 (EP,KR,US);
F21V29/80 (EP,KR,US);
F21V3/00 (EP,KR,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | Leuchte | [2012/19] | English: | Lighting device with reverse tapered heatsink | [2012/19] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage avec dissipateur thermique conique inversé | [2014/40] |
Former [2012/19] | Lumière | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11790482.1 / EP2446186 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110790482) is 03.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | GB | 03.06.2015 | IE | 03.06.2015 | LU | 03.06.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | FR | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
GB | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IE | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
LU | 03.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2177812 (GOLDEN VALLEY OPTOELECTRONIC C [CN]) [X] 1,2,4-7,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037] * * figure 1 * [I] 3,9-12,14; | [XI]US2008285270 (CHIANG CHENG-LIEN [TW]) [X] 1-7,9,10,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 7A,B * [I] 12,14; | [XI]US2006198147 (GE SHICHAO [CN]) [X] 1,2,4-8,14,15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0070] * * figure 9 * [I] 3,9-13; | [XI]JP2005166578 (HAMAI ELECTRIC LAMP) [X] 1,4-7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3,11,12,14 | Examination | EP1826481 | KR20100037353 | CN201391774Y |