EP2462882 - Interventional catheters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Bayer Medical Care Inc. 1 Bayer Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Medrad, Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torrance, Casey 16808 93rd St. SE Snohomish, WA 98290 / US | 02 /
Wulfman, Edward I. 18807 - 136th Ave. N.E. Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
Torrance, Casey 16808 93rd St SE Snohomish, WA Washington 98290 / US | ||
02 /
Wulfman, Edward, I. 18807 - 136th Ave. N.E. Woodinville, WA Washington 98072 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2014/07] | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12152932.5 | 03.10.2007 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20060828209P | 04.10.2006 Original published format: US 828209 P | US20070894173P | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 894173 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462882 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462882 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/3207 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/3207 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (KR);
A61B1/00087 (US);
A61B1/05 (US);
A61B17/32 (KR);
A61B17/32002 (US);
A61B17/320725 (US);
A61B17/320758 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (US);
A61B8/445 (US);
A61M1/71 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/80 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/84 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/00 (KR);
A61M25/0082 (US);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M5/16831 (US);
A61B2017/22079 (US);
A61B2017/320004 (US);
A61B2017/320032 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2012/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Interventionskatheter | [2012/24] | English: | Interventional catheters | [2012/24] | French: | Cathéters chirurgicaux | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07843776.1 / EP2068730 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070843776) is 04.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2007 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.10.2007 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.10.2007 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9521576 (MICROVENA CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* pages 30-31, lines 6-5 - page 44, lines 5-18; figures 3-6,10 *; | [A]US2002169467 (HEITZMANN HAROLD A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 4-6, lines 52-25 - column 11, lines 1-23; figures 2-8 *; | [YA]US6503261 (BRUNEAU RODNEY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,15 * column 2, lines 28-60 - columns 3-4, lines 53-15; figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 28-60 - columns 3-4, lines 53-15; figures 1-4 * [A] 14; | [Y]US6565588 (CLEMENT THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 16, line 52 - column 18, line 44; figures 2-14 *; | [YA]WO2004080507 (PATHWAY MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US], et al) [Y] 14 * pages 14-15, lines 13-2 - page 18, lines 15-19; figures 5,6 * [A] 1-13,15; | [A]WO2004080345 (PATHWAY MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 33; figures 8,9 * | by applicant | US4445509 | US6565588 | US2004006358 | US2004220519 | US6818001 |