EP2465533 - Methods and compositions comprising supramolecular constructs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AC Immune SA EPFL Innovation Park Building B 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2015/07] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states AC Immune S.A. EPFL-PSE Building B 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolau, Claude Yves 166 Greenwood Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
Greferath, Ruth Am Ziegelhof 2 77694 Kehl / DE | 03 /
Hickman, David Route de Vallaire 1 1025 Saint-Sulpice / CH | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12153152.9 | 22.02.2005 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | US20040783975 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: US 783975 | US20040958211 | 04.10.2004 Original published format: US 958211 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465533 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2465533 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, C07K14/47, C07K16/18 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K14/435 (KR);
A61K39/0007 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6093 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
C07K2317/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | AL | 19.12.2012 | BA | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MK | 19.12.2012 | YU | 19.12.2012 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen mit supramolekularen Konstrukten | [2012/25] | English: | Methods and compositions comprising supramolecular constructs | [2012/25] | French: | Procédés et compositions comprenant des constructions supramoléculaires | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05723323.1 / EP1763364 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 25.07.2015 | [2015/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003108551 (NICOLAU YVES CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 9; | [XP]US2004242845 (NICOLAU YVES CLAUDE [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0064] , [0068] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0099] *; | [T]WO2007068412 (AC IMMUNE SA [CH], et al) [T] * example - *; | [X] - BEKA SOLOMON, "IMMUNOLOGICAL APPROACH FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, BIRKHAEUSER, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, (20030101), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:10.1385/JMN:20:3:283, ISSN 0895-8696, pages 283 - 286, XP008074073 [X] 1-8,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * page 283, column 2, paragraph l - page 284, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/JMN:20:3:283 | [AD] - NICOLAU C ET AL, "A LIPOSOME-BASED THERAPEUTIC VACCINE AGAINST BETA-AMYLOID PLAQUES ON THE PANCREAS OF TRANSGENIC NORBA MICE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020219), vol. 99, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2332 - 2337, XP009062068 [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.022627199 | [T] - MUHS ET AL, "Improved memory capacity of amyloid precursor protein transgenic mice through passive administration of a monoclonal antibody inducing a conformational shift of amyloid-beta", ALZHEIMER'S & DEMENTIA: THE JOURNAL OF THE ALZHEIMER'SASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060701), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1552-5260, page S21, XP005547955 [T] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jalz.2006.05.066 | [T] - MUHS ANDREAS ET AL, Liposomal vaccines with conformation-specific amyloid peptide antigens define immune response and efficacy in APP transgenic mice, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, VOL. 104, NR. 23, PAGE(S) 9810-9815, (200706), ISSN 0027-8424, XP002542049 [T] * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0703137104 | by applicant | - ALVING ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1992), vol. 60, pages 2438 - 2444 | - PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2332 - 2337 | - NICOLAU ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2332 - 2337 | - C. NICOLAU; R.GREFERATH; T.S. BALABAN; J. LAZARTE; R. HOPKINS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2002), vol. 99, pages 2332 - 2337 | - P.-F. TOSI; D. RADU; C.NICOLAU, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. CHEM., (1995), vol. 212, pages 494 - 500 | - FUKUDA H; SHIMIZU T; NAKAJIMA M; MORI H; SHIRASAWA T, BIOORG. MED. CHEM.LETT., (1999), vol. 9, pages 953 - 956 | - PETKOVA AT; ISHII Y; BALBACH JJ; ANTZUTKIN ON; LEAPMAN RD; DELAGLIO F; TYCKO R, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (2002), vol. 99, pages 16742 - 16747 | US20030449573 | US20040783975 |