EP2482542 - Apparatus, system, and method of use of imaging assembly on mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 700 Visions Drive Skaneateles Falls, New York 13153 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Havens, William H. Honeywell International Inc., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Wang, Ynjiun Paul Honeywell International Inc., Patent services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Stiles, Jonathan Honeywell International Inc., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12153189.1 | 30.01.2012 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | US201113018138 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US201113018138 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2482542 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2482542 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, // H04N1/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06K7/10722 (CN);
G06V20/40 (US);
G06K19/06028 (US);
G06K7/10881 (CN);
G06V30/142 (US);
H04N23/45 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (CN);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (CN);
H04N23/80 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, System und Verfahren zur Verwendung einer Bildgebungsanordnung eines mobilen Endgeräts | [2012/31] | English: | Apparatus, system, and method of use of imaging assembly on mobile terminal | [2012/31] | French: | Appareil, système et procédé d'utilisation d'un ensemble d'imagerie sur un terminal mobile | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2005036044 (FUNAKURA HIROYUKI [JP]); | [XAI]US2008310686 (KRETZ MARTIN [SE]) |