EP2560304 - Reducing the influence of interference waves generated by a touch panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Tadashi c/o Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications Japan, Inc 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12153289.9 | 31.01.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | US201161525471P | 19.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161525471 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2560304 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2560304 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B15/00 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H04B15/005 (EP,US);
H04N5/50 (US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,US);
H04N21/4436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verminderung des Störeinflusses durch ein berührungs-sensitives Eingabegerät | [2013/08] | English: | Reducing the influence of interference waves generated by a touch panel | [2013/08] | French: | Réduire l'influence des ondes parasites générés par un écran tactile | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH06303772 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 [I] 2-5,11,12; | [XA]US2005064842 (PATEL VIPUL M [US]) [X] 1,15 * figure 2 * [A] 2-12; | [X]WO2008000916 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0035] - [0054]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2009015215 (AJRAM SAMI [US], et al) [X] 13,14* paragraphs [0030] - [0052]; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US2009253391 (ZHANG LIGANG [CN]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0025] - [0028] - [0032] - [0035]; figures 3,4 * [A] 2-12; | [Y]US2011075721 (MINAKAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-10 * paragraphs [0058] - [0067] - [0086] - [0102] - [0124] , [0135] , [0136] , [0150] - [0152]; figures 1,6,9,10 *; | [A]US2011074211 (HAMPO RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-12,15 * figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH06303772 |