EP2458372 - Method for measuring small angle x-ray scattering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Yoshio c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo, 196-8666 / JP | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12153438.2 | 04.07.2006 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | JP20050247473 | 29.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005247473 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458372 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458372 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/201 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
G01N23/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen von kleinwinkliger Röntgenstrahlstreuung | [2012/22] | English: | Method for measuring small angle x-ray scattering | [2012/22] | French: | Procédé pour la mesure de la diffusion de rayons x à angle de petite taille | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 27.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06767830.0 / EP1925932 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060767830) is 26.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004156474 (YOKHIN BORIS [IL], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062]; figure - * * paragraph [0077] *; | [A]EP1462795 (RIGAKU DENKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1477795 (BRUKER AXS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0018] ** paragraph [0028] * |