EP2492134 - Power socket assembly for recharging the batteries of electric vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/32] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magno, Giorgio Via A. Manzoni 25 24030 Brembate Sopra (Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
Rocchini, Matteo Via Sant'Antonino 18 24122 Bergamo / IT | 03 /
Marchesi, Diego Via Don F. Agazzi 8 24066 Pedrengo (Bergamo) / IT | [2017/32] |
Former [2012/35] | 01 /
Magno, Giorgio Via A. Manzoni 25 I-24030 Brembate Sopra (Bergamo) / IT | ||
02 /
Rocchini, Matteo Via Sant'Antonino 18 I-24122 Bergamo / IT | |||
03 /
Marchesi, Diego Via Don F. Agazzi 8 I-24066 Pedrengo (Bergamo) / IT | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2017/32] |
Former [2012/35] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12153844.1 | 03.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00092 | 04.02.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110092 | [2012/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2492134 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2492134 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492134 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, H01R13/447, H01R13/62, H01R13/639 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H01R13/6397 (EP);
B60L53/16 (EP);
H01R13/447 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2012/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steckdosenbaugruppe zum Wiederaufladen von Batterien von elektrischen Fahrzeugen | [2012/35] | English: | Power socket assembly for recharging the batteries of electric vehicles | [2012/35] | French: | Ensemble de prise électrique pour recharger les batteries de véhicules électriques | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2012 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | IE | 03.02.2018 | LU | 03.02.2018 | MT | 03.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.02.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 03.02.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
MT | 03.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 03.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2754644 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,14 * figures 1-3; claims 1,3,5,6 * [Y] 5,6,8,9,12; | [XY]DE102007002025 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0011] - [0017]; figure 1; claims 2,3,4 * [Y] 5,6,8,9,12; | [Y]US2010013433 (BAXTER DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,8,9,12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0025] - [0032]; figures 1-4; claims 10,12,13,15 *; | [Y]US2009286414 (OHTOMO YOSUKE [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figure 3; claim 3 *; | [A]FR2925458 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-14 * pages 3,4; figures 1-4; claims 1,2,4 * |