EP2492148 - Roof luggage holder for a motor vehicle roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAC Products Europe GmbH Konsumstrasse 45 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauschulz, Heinrich Auf dem Sonneborn 15A 44309 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
Felchner, Michael Wiedener Straße 160 42327 Wuppertal / DE | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Christophersen & Partner Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12154217.9 | 07.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | DE20111000935 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011000935 | [2012/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492148 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492148 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/045 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
B60R9/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | Dachlastenträger für ein Fahrzeugdach | [2012/35] | English: | Roof luggage holder for a motor vehicle roof | [2012/35] | French: | Galerie de toit pour un toit de véhicule | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 23.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2012 | AL | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | IT | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | RS | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | SM | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 07.02.2015 | LU | 07.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.02.2012 | |
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MK | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.02.2012 | |
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
SM | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
IT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RS | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008252100 (SALVADOR CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0031]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 5-9,12; | [Y]US2006060621 (KLINKMAN JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 5-9,12 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0029]; figure - *; | [A]DE102005029111 (JAC PRODUCTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0068]; figure - *; | [A]US6286739 (STAPLETON CRAIG [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 6, line 17; figure - *; | [A]DE29504783U (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 9; figure -; claim - * | Examination | US2005017037 | by applicant | DE102007047755 | EP1728686 | EP2052913 |