EP2479286 - MicroRNA-based methods and compositions for the diagnosis and treatment of solid cancers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Croce, Carlo 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Columbus, OH 43221 / US | 02 /
Calin, George 12210 Willow Brook Lane Pearland, TX 77584-6534 / US | 03 /
Volinia, Stefano Corso Piave, 17 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12154307.8 | 03.01.2007 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | US20060756585P | 05.01.2006 Original published format: US 756585 P | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479286 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479286 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/113 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,US);
C12N2320/12 (EP,US);
C12N2320/30 (US);
C12N2330/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen auf Mikro-RNA-Basis zur Diagnose und Behandlung von festen Krebsen | [2012/30] | English: | MicroRNA-based methods and compositions for the diagnosis and treatment of solid cancers | [2012/30] | French: | Procédés à base de micro ARN et compositions pour le diagnostic et le traitement des cancers solides | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07717903.4 / EP1969147 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070717903) is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2007 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | IE | 03.01.2014 | LU | 03.01.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.01.2007 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.01.2014 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IORIO MARILENA V ET AL, "MicroRNA gene expression deregulation in human breast cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD., US, (20050801), vol. 65, no. 16, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 7065 - 7070, XP002457421 [A] 1-12 * tables 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-1783 | [A] - JUN LU ET AL, "Micro RNA expression profiles classify human cancers", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20050609), vol. 435, no. 7043, doi:10.1038/NATURE03702, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 834 - 838, XP008125350 [A] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03702 | by applicant | US5427916 | US2002086356 | US2004014113 | US5252479 | US5139941 | WO9413788 | WO9324641 | US2002173478 | US2004018176 | US5849902 | US4987071 | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4837028 | US5019369 | US4920016 | - JEMAL, A. ET AL., CA CANCER J CLIN., (2002), vol. 52, pages 23 - 47 | - SIMARD, J. ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2002), vol. 143, no. 6, pages 2029 - 40 | - PESCHEL, R.E.; J.W. COLBERG, LANCET, (2003), vol. 4, pages 233 - 41 | - NELSON, W.G. ET AL., N. ENGL. J MED, (2003), vol. 349, no. 4, pages 366 - 81 | - PUNGLIA ET AL., N. ENGL. J MED, (2003), vol. 349, no. 4, pages 335 - 42 | - NATHANSON, K.L. ET AL., HUMAN MOL. GEN., (2001), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 715 - 720 | - BR. J CANCER, (2000), vol. 83, no. 10, pages 1301 - 08 | - SYRJAKOSKI, K. ET AL., J NATL. CANCER INST., (2000), vol. 92, pages 1529 - 31 | - BURR, H.A. ET AL., THE ONCOLOGIST, (2005), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 183 - 190 | - GOODMAN, G.E., THORAX, (2002), vol. 57, pages 994 - 999 | - CHENG, A.M. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages 1290 - 1297 | - ISHIZUKA, A. ET AL., GENES DEV, (2002), vol. 16, pages 2497 - 2508 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. US.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 15524 - 15529 | - RIGBY ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1977), vol. 113, pages 237 - 251 | - FIENBERG ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 132, pages 6 - 13 | - ZENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 1327 - 1333 | - TUSCHL, NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 446 - 448 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - MIYAGISHI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES DEV., (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - LEE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 500 - 505 | - PAUL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 505 - 508 | - RABINOWITZ, J.E. ET AL., J VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 791 - 801 | - DORNBURG, GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 301 - 310 | - EGLITIS, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 608 - 614 | - MILLER, HUM. GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - ANDERSON, NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, pages 25 - 30 | - XIA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, pages 3096 - 3101 | - FISHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 520 - 532 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3826 | - STEIN; CHENG, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1004 | - WERNER; UHLENBECK, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2092 - 96 | - HAMMANN ET AL., ANTISENSE AND NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1999), vol. 9, pages 25 - 31 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG, (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1988), vol. 18, pages 6949 - 53 | - LIU, C.-G. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11755 - 11760 | - CALIN, G.A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11755 - 11760 | - IORIO, M.V. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 7065 - 7070 | - GRIFFITHS-JONES, S., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2004), vol. 32, pages D109 - 11 | - TUSHER, V. G. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 5116 - 21 | - JUNG, S. H. ET AL., BIOSTATISTICS, (2005), vol. 6, pages 157 - 69 | - LU, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 834 - 8 | - HE, L. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 828 - 833 | - CHAN, J.A. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 6029 - 6033 | - EIS, P.S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 3627 - 3632 | - METZLER, M. ET AL., GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER, (2004), vol. 39, pages 167 - 169 | - LEWIS, B.P. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 120, pages 15 - 20 | - ALI, A.A. ET AL., FASEB J., (1993), vol. 7, pages 931 - 937 | - BUCK, M.B. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 491 - 498 | - BISWAS, S. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 687 - 692 | - JOHNSON, S.M. ET AL., CELL, (2005), vol. 120, pages 635 - 647 | - O'DONNELL, K.A. ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 839 - 843 | - CIMMINO, A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 13944 - 13949 |