EP2626432 - Method for the diagnosis of myeloid neoplasias and solid tumors and diagnostic kits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitätsklinikum Freiburg Hugstetter Strasse 49 79106 Freiburg / DE | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pahl, Heike Spargelweg 32 79112 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Jutzi, Jonas Schwabentorring 6 79089 Freiburg / DE | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2013/33] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12154405.0 | 08.02.2012 | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626432 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2626432 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose von myeloiden Neoplasien und feste Tumore und Diagnosekits | [2013/33] | English: | Method for the diagnosis of myeloid neoplasias and solid tumors and diagnostic kits | [2013/33] | French: | Procédé pour le diagnostic de néoplasies myéloïdes et de tumeurs solides et trousses de diagnostic | [2013/33] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 13.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2012 | AL | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | RS | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | IE | 08.02.2015 | LU | 08.02.2015 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MK | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.02.2012 | |
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008060090 (UNIV NAT CHONNAM IND FOUND [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2002197611 (CHAGOVETZ ALEXANDER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 10,11 * the whole document * * page 6, column r * [A] 1-9,12; | [X]US2005118625 (MOUNTS WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 10,11 * sequence 294246 *; | [X]US2009053752 (BLACKMAN BRETT R [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * sequence 15 *; | [X]WO2005085474 (CLONTECH LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * sequence 15 * | [XA] - KAUFMANN KAI B ET AL, "A novel murine model of myeloproliferative disorders generated by overexpression of the transcription factor NF-E2", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20120116), vol. 209, no. 1, doi:10.1084/JEM.20110540, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 35 - 50, XP008152985 [X] 10,11 * the whole document * * page 47 * [A] 1-9,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20110540 | [XDA] - PHILIPP S. GOERTTLER ET AL, "Gene expression profiling in polycythaemia vera: overexpression of transcription factor NF-E2", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (20050401), vol. 129, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2141.2005.05416.x, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 138 - 150, XP055030489 [XD] 10,11 * the whole document * * page 138 * [A] 1-9,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2005.05416.x | [XDA] - W. WANG ET AL, "AML1 is overexpressed in patients with myeloproliferative neoplasms and mediates JAK2V617F-independent overexpression of NF-E2", BLOOD, (20100715), vol. 116, no. 2, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-11-254664, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 254 - 266, XP055030492 [XD] 10,11 * the whole document * * page 255 * [A] 1-9,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-11-254664 | [A] - R SHIVDASANI, "Transcription factor NF-E2 is required for platelet formation independent of the actions of thrombopoeitin/MGDF in megakaryocyte development", CELL, (19950601), vol. 81, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(95)90531-6, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 695 - 704, XP055030639 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90531-6 | [A] - T. BEAN, "Multiple regions of p45 NF-E2 are required for beta-globin gene expression in erythroid cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19970615), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:10.1093/nar/25.12.2509, pages 2509 - 2515, XP055030727 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.12.2509 | [XDA] - TSUTOMU TOKI ET AL, "Functional characterization of the two alternative promoters of human p45 NF-E2 gene", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (20001001), vol. 28, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0301-472X(00)00523-3, ISSN 0301-472X, pages 1113 - 1119, XP055030495 [XD] 10,11 * the whole document * * page 1114, column r - page 1115, column l * [A] 1-9,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-472X(00)00523-3 | Examination | US2011104680 | by applicant | - IGARASHI, NATURE, (1994), vol. 367, pages 568 - 572 | - GOERTTLER ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, (2005), vol. 129, pages 138 - 150 | - WANG ET AL., BLOOD, (2010), pages 254 - 266 | - TOKI ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (2000), vol. 28, pages 1113 - 1119 | - TEMERINAC ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 95, pages 2569 - 2576 | - STEIMLE ET AL., ANN.HEMATHOL., (2007), vol. 86, pages 239 - 244 | - SCHREIBER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 6419 | - MIGNOTTE ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6548 - 52 | - ROELZ ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (2010), vol. 38, pages 792 - 7 |