EP2626757 - Finite state machine for system management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Deutschland GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications Technology Dresden GmbH Am Waldschlösschen 1 01099 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Kay Kronenstraße 45 01129 Dresden / DE | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 12154410.0 | 08.02.2012 | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626757 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/045 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
G05B19/045 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (US);
G05B2219/23289 (EP,US);
G06F9/4498 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Endzustandsmaschine zur Systemverwaltung | [2013/33] | English: | Finite state machine for system management | [2013/33] | French: | Machine en état fini pour système de gestion | [2013/33] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 29.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2017 | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | 07.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2403821 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * page 14, line 10 - line 17 * * page 3 * * page 6 - page 7; figure 3 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 17 * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]US2007157042 (JAHAGIRDAR SANJEEV [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0090] *; | [XY]GB2461648 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-12 * figure 4 * * page 2 - page 3 * * figure 5 * * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 2 * [Y] 10,11; | [A] - VASSILIS DIMOPOULOS ET AL, "A Memory-Efficient Reconfigurable Aho-Corasick FSM Implementation for Intrusion Detection Systems", EMBEDDED COMPUTER SYSTEMS: ARCHITECTURES, MODELING AND SIMULATION, 200 7. IC-SAMOS 2007. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1058-3, pages 186 - 193, XP031124289 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - GRZEGORZ BOROWIK ET AL, "Efficient logic controller design", BROADBAND AND BIOMEDICAL COMMUNICATIONS (IB2COM), 2010 FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20101215), doi:10.1109/IB2COM.2010.5723633, ISBN 978-1-4244-6951-2, pages 1 - 6, XP031922428 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IB2COM.2010.5723633 |