EP2492964 - Semiconductor device and device with use of it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Power Semiconductor Device, Ltd. 2-2, Omika-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [2014/36] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terakawa, Takeshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Matsuyoshi, Satoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Narita, Kazutoyo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Mori, Mutsuhiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12154909.1 | 10.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110035304 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011035304 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492964 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/861, H01L29/872 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H01L29/872 (EP,US);
H01L24/01 (EP,US);
H01L29/0619 (EP,US);
H01L29/8611 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12036 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12036, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/351, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung und Vorrichtung damit | [2012/35] | English: | Semiconductor device and device with use of it | [2012/35] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et dispositif à utiliser avec celui-ci | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0450306 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 6, line 10 - line 52; figure 1A *; | [Y]US5552622 (KIMURA MITSUTERU [JP]) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 60; figures 1A-1C *; | [Y]DE19549202 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1496549 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023]; figures 3A-3D *; | [Y]US2006131686 (WU CHING-YUAN [TW]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043]; figures 5A-5B *; | [X]US2006244006 (FUJIHIRA TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4* paragraphs [0152] - [0153]; figure 24 *; | [XYI] - MORI M ET AL, "6.5 KV ULTRA SOFT & FAST RECOVERY DIODE (U-SFD) WITH HIGH REVERSE RECOVERY CAPABILITY", 12TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND IC S. ISPSD 2000. PROCEEDINGS. TOULOUSE, FRANCE, MAY 22 - 25, 2000; [INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES & IC'S], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20000522), doi:10.1109/ISPSD.2000.856785, ISBN 978-0-7803-6269-7, pages 115 - 118, XP000987844 [X] 1,3,4 * page 115 - page 117; figures 2,9 * [Y] 2,5,7-9 [I] 6,10-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPSD.2000.856785 | by applicant | JPH03250670 | JPH099522 |