EP2452671 - Topical Pharmaceutical Formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futura Medical Developments Limited Surrey Technology Centre 40 Occam Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7YG / GB | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Adrian Francis 12 Limeway Terrace Dorking, Surrey RH4 1HZ / GB | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12154983.6 | 15.02.2008 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | GB20070004846 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: GB 0704846 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2452671 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | Topische pharmazeutische Formulierung | [2012/20] | English: | Topical Pharmaceutical Formulation | [2012/20] | French: | Formulation pharmaceutique topique | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08709428.0 / EP2131813 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080709428) is 02.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP1588697 | US2005244522 | - OBATA ET AL., INT. J. PHARM, (1993), vol. 89, no. 32, pages 191 - 198 |