EP2586786 - Sulphated amino sugars with anti-inflammatory properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diosamine Development Corporation 122 Timber Drive Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | For all designated states Pharos Pharmaceuticals Inc. 5762 Ravenspur Dr., No. 413 Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | [2014/37] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Diosamine Development Corporation 280 Madison Avenue Suite 912-206 New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharos Pharmaceuticals Inc. 110 Grosvenor Road Rochester, NY 14610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seed, Michael Peter c/o William Harvey Research Institute Charterhouse Square London, EC1M 6BQ / GB | 02 /
Burnet, Michael c/o Synovo GmbH Paul-Ehrlich Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
Gutke, Hans Jürgen c/o Synovo GmbH Paul-Ehrlich Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
Seed, Michael Peter c/o William Harvey Research Institute Charterhouse Square London, EC1M 6BQ / GB | ||
02 /
Burnet, Michael c/o Synovo GmbH Paul-Ehrlich Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
Gutcke, Hans Jürgen c/o Synovo GmbH Paul-Ehrlich Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | Representative(s) | Johnson, Stephen William, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | [2013/18] | Application number, filing date | 12155305.1 | 14.11.2007 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | GB20060022688 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: GB 0622688 | GB20070011138 | 11.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0711138 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586786 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/04, C07H15/04, A61K31/7008, C07K9/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C07K9/005 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07H13/04 (EP,US);
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
C07H5/06 (EP,US);
C07H5/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | HR | 01.11.2013 | Title | German: | Sulfatierte Aminozucker mit entzündungshemmender Wirkung | [2013/18] | English: | Sulphated amino sugars with anti-inflammatory properties | [2013/18] | French: | Des sucres aminés sulphatés avec des propriétés anti-inflammatoires | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 19.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07822603.2 / EP2144920 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070822603) is 04.02.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2014 | Decision despatched | 21.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 13.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 13.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 13.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 13.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.02.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2012 | 14.02.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2012 | 14.02.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2012 | 30.11.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2014 | 30.11.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2015 | 30.11.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9635700 (GLYCOMED INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 43; claims 13-19 * * examples 13-17 *; | [AD]US5631245 (DRUBE CLAIRMONT G [US]) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1,2 *; | [AD] - RONCA ET AL, "Anti-inflammatory activity of chondroitin sulfate", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, (199805), vol. 6, ISSN 1063-4584, pages 14 - 21, XP022221988 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1063-4584(98)80006-X | by applicant | US5631245 | US5202311 | - LOWE, IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 186, pages 19 - 36 | - J.L. MAGNANI, ARCHIV. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (2004), vol. 426, pages 122 - 131 | - VARKI ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 1R - 27R | - KOLAROVA ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 273, pages 109 - 114 | - BOLTON ET AL., INFLAMM. RES., (2005), vol. 2, page S121 | - RONCA ET AL., OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, (1998), vol. 6, no. A, pages 14 - 21 | - YEH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 22, no. 20, pages 7184 - 7192 | - ZITTERMANN ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (2006), vol. 168, no. 3, pages 835 - 846 | - PRESTA ET AL., CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 16, pages 159 - 178 | - KOGELBERG ET AL., CHEM. BIO. CHEM., (2002), vol. 3, pages 1072 - 1077 | - ZHOU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, no. 45, pages 14793 - 14802 | - INNIS ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 41, pages 39969 - 39977 | - YONGHAO ET AL., J. AM. SOC. MASS SPECTROMETRY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 524 - 535 | - YONGHAO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, no. 37, pages 32200 - 32208 | - WALSH ET AL., CLINICAL SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 341 - 346 | - CAHALON ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 1517 - 1522 | - SHAW ET AL., STRUCTURE, (2004), vol. 12, pages 2081 - 2089 | - DAWES; PEPPER, THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1992), vol. 67, no. 4, pages 468 - 472 | - VENKATACHALAM ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, no. 30, pages 19311 - 19320 | - CYTOKINE, (2006), vol. 33, pages 156 - 165 |