EP2492934 - Dye-sensitized solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Byong-Cheol c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ji-Won c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Do, Young-Rag c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12155622.9 | 15.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | KR20110015550 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: KR 20110015550 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2492934 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2492934 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H01G9/209 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
H10K85/344 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbstoffsensibilisierte Solarzelle | [2012/35] | English: | Dye-sensitized solar cell | [2012/35] | French: | Cellule solaire sensibilisée aux colorants | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009126789 (LI CHUNG-HUA [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]KR20090076407 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009157879 (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2011030792 (MIGUEZ HERNAN [ES], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - MICHAEL GRATZEL, INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, no. 20 |