EP2489478 - Electric Power Tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiya, Shingo c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Munetaka c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12155826.6 | 16.02.2012 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | JP20110032951 | 18.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011032951 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2489478 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2489478 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP);
B25F5/006 (EP);
H01P1/2013 (EP);
H02K7/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2012/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Werkzeuge | [2012/34] | English: | Electric Power Tools | [2012/34] | French: | Outils électriques | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006123034 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0024] , [0025] * * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]JP2006332475 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] , [0014] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2011032951 |