EP2628418 - System and method for documenting the transfer of an object to be supplied to a recipient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erwin Renz Metallwarenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Boschstrasse 3 71737 Kirchberg / DE | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephan, Mayer Königsberger Straße 8/1 71737 Kirchberg / DE | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/34] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstraße 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12156001.5 | 17.02.2012 | [2013/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628418 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47G29/14 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
A47G29/141 (EP);
G07F17/13 (EP,US);
A47G2029/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und ein Verfahren zur Dokumentation der Übergabe eines zuzustellenden Gegenstandes an einen Empfänger | [2013/34] | English: | System and method for documenting the transfer of an object to be supplied to a recipient | [2013/34] | French: | Système et un procédé de documentation de la transmission d'un objet à remettre à un destinataire | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0141605 (GUARANTEED DELIVERIES COM [US]) [X] 1-9,11 * page 13, line 1 - line 2; figures 2,4,10,11 * [Y] 10,15; | [AD]DE10124707 (FASBENDER JOERG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7,10-12* paragraph [0022]; claim 9 *; | [YA]US2007118488 (BOZZOMO ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 10,15 * claims 2,3,7,8 * [A] 6-9; | [E]DE102010041617 (RENZ ERWIN METALLWAREN [DE]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1432688 | EP0492115 | US5223829 | DE29712361U | EP0821518 | US5774053 | DE29807184U | DE29813416U | DE19803707 | US5979750 | WO0009841 | DE20016195U | WO0076378 | WO0115579 | DE20021620U | WO0139638 | WO0151744 | DE10049612 | DE20022357U | DE20105699U | DE10033664 | DE20111053U | WO0178563 | EP1161909 | WO0217246 | WO0224040 | DE10046397 | DE10218178 | DE10124707 | DE10125948 | US2003154891 | DE69727231T | DE102009004635 |