EP2514895 - ASSEMBLY OF TWO COMPONENTS, IN PARTICULAR HINGE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/43] | Assembly of two components, in particular hinge parts | ||
[2018/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simonswerk, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Bosfelder Weg 5 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liermann, Nicolas Allerstraße 43 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12156077.5 | 17.02.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | DE20111002216 | 21.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011002216 | [2012/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2514895 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2514895 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2514895 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04, E05D9/00, // E05D3/18 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
E05D7/0423 (EP,US);
E05D9/00 (EP,US);
E05D3/186 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | E05D7/04, E05D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2012/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON ZWEI BAUTEILEN, INSBESONDERE BANDTEILEN | [2018/08] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF TWO COMPONENTS, IN PARTICULAR HINGE PARTS | [2018/08] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE DEUX COMPOSANTS, NOTAMMENT DE PARTIES DE CHARNIÈRE | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/43] | Anordnung von zwei Bauteilen, insbesondere Bandteilen | ||
Former [2012/43] | Assembly of two components, in particular hinge parts | ||
Former [2012/43] | Agencement de deux composants, notamment de parties de charnière | Examination procedure | 17.02.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 06.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | IE | 17.02.2019 | LU | 17.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1308592 (SIMONSWERK [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017]; figures 1,4,6,7 *; | [AD]EP2186979 (SIMONSWERK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10* paragraphs [0016] , [0019]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP2186979 |