EP2535952 - Light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu Seoul, 04637 / KR | For all designated states Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University ERICA Campus 55 Hanyangdaehak-ro Sangnok-gu Ansan-si, Kyeonggi-do 426-791 / KR | [2019/22] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu Seoul, 04637 / KR | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 416, Hangang-daero Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | ||
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 20F Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Dae Seob Seoul Square 20F Namdaemunno 5-ga, Jung-gu 100-714 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Moon, Yong Tae Seoul Square 20F Namdaemunno 5-ga, Jung-gu 100-714 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Shim, Jong-In 104-1702, Daechi Hyundai Apt., Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu 135-280 Seoul / KR | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/51] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12156610.3 | 22.02.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | KR20110057373 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: KR 20110057373 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535952 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535952 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535952 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/06, H01S5/343, // F21S13/00, G02F1/13357, H01L33/32, H01L33/48 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H01L33/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/04 (KR,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21V29/507 (EP,US);
F21V29/83 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/51] | H01L33/06, // H01L33/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2012/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelemnt | [2012/51] | English: | Light emitting device | [2012/51] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 20.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2012 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | GB | 22.02.2020 | IE | 22.02.2020 | LU | 22.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | FR | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
GB | 22.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
GB | 22.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
GB | 22.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
GB | 22.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IE | 22.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
FR | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
LU | 22.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2004031770 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2,5-12,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0046] * [A] 3,4; | [XA]JP2004087763 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3,5-10,13 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * [A] 12; | [A]EP1667292 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-11,13 * abstract * * figures 1,5-7,11 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0089] *; | [A]CN1937267 (HUACAN PHOTOELECTRIC CO LTD WU [CN]) [A] 1,5-7,9-12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 13 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 24 *; | [A]US2007090339 (LEE DONG Y [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2009057691 (KIM TAE YUN [KR], et al) [A] 1,3,5-10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X]US2011037049 (TACHIBANA KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0049] * |