EP2632040 - Transformer configuration for a back-to-back converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | 07.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | 07.03.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berglund, Mats Kyna 461 784 78 Borlänge / SE | 02 /
Akesson, Bo Sjöuddsvägen 14 777 90 Smedjebacken / SE | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 12156790.3 | 24.02.2012 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632040 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00, H02M5/45, H02M5/458, H01F30/12, H01F30/04 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
H01F30/12 (EP,US);
H02M5/44 (US);
H02M5/4505 (EP,US);
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H01F2038/006 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Transformatoranordnung für eine Kurzkupplung | [2013/35] | English: | Transformer configuration for a back-to-back converter | [2013/35] | French: | Arrangement de transformateur pour un convertisseur dos-à-dos | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 05.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2929016 (JOSEF KREUZER) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5886888 (AKAMATSU MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1873885 (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011044010 (LEDEZMA ENRIQUE [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XI] - ZELIANG SHU ET AL, "Single-Phase Back-To-Back Converter for Active Power Balancing, Reactive Power Compensation, and Harmonic Filtering in Traction Power System", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110201), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TPEL.2010.2060360, ISSN 0885-8993, pages 334 - 343, XP011334723 [X] 1-4,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 5-9,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPEL.2010.2060360 | [A] - J. Graham, B. Jonsson, R.S. Moni, "Teh Garabi 2000 MW Interconnection Back-to-Back HVDC to connect weak AC systems", (20041204), ABB, URL: http://library.abb.com/GLOBAL/SCOT/scot221.nsf/VerityDisplay/0D50A8FCE76DB2C9C1256FDA003B4D43/$File/THE%20GARABI%202000%20MW%20INTERCONNECTION.pdf, (20120829), XP002682561 [A] 2,11 * the whole document * |