EP2492725 - Vehicular lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 4-8-3, Takanawa Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Asami c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD, Shizuoka Works 500, Kitawaki, Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12156814.1 | 24.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110038415 | 24.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011038415 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2492725 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2492725 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, F21S8/10, // F21Y101/02, F21W101/02 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/0006 (EP,US);
G02B6/0001 (KR);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/237 (EP,US);
F21S43/245 (EP,US);
F21S43/247 (EP,US);
G02B6/002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrzeuglampe | [2012/35] | English: | Vehicular lamp | [2012/35] | French: | Lampe véhiculaire | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 04.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19850443 (VALEO BELEUCHTUNG DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0003] , [ 0026] , [ 0029] - [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2010157619 (CHINNIAH JEYACHANDRABOSE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [ 0021] , [ 0022] , [ 0032]; figures 1, 8 *; | [Y]US2006007704 (MORI AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0008] , [ 0009] , [ 0012] , [ 0045] - [0047] - [ 0051] , [ 0053]; figures 2-7, 11 * | by applicant | JP2002367404 |