EP2492108 - A method for making covers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPUS Spolka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia Ul. Torunska 8 44-122 Gliwice / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states OPUS Spolka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia ul. Torunska 8 44-122 Gliwice / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macha, Aleksander OPUS Spólka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia ul. Hlaski 10 44-100 Gliwice / PL | 02 /
Nawrat, Krystian OPUS Spólka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia ul. Willowa 21 44-121 Gliwice / PL | 03 /
Shier, Michael 199 Ridgwood Road Yerwood, Dorset / GB | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Kuczynska, Teresa Polservice Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych Sp. z o.o. Patent Department Ul. Bluszczanska 73 00-712 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Kuczynska, Teresa Polservice Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych Sp. z o.o. Patent Department ul. Bluszczanska 73 00-712 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 12156891.9 | 24.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | PL20110394057 | 28.02.2011 Original published format: PL 39405711 | [2012/35] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492108 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492108 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B42D3/02, B42F13/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
B42D15/0093 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Umschlägen | [2012/35] | English: | A method for making covers | [2012/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de couvertures | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.10.2014 | AT | 15.10.2014 | BE | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | IE | 24.02.2015 | LU | 24.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 24.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 24.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 15.10.2014 | |
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 15.10.2014 | |
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5030027 (BACHRACH SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * column 2 - column 4; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5876143 (ONG BON S [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-9* column 13, line 18 - line 30 * |