EP2492750 - Photoresist compositions and methods of forming photolithographic patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bae, Young Cheol 74 Brown Street Weston, MA Massachusetts 02493 / US | 02 /
Park, Jong Keun 307 Central Street - Apt. 1201 Hudson, MA Massachusetts 01749 / US | 03 /
Lee, Seung-Hyun 78 Silver Leaf Way - Apt. 32 Marlborough, MA Massachusetts 01752 / US | 04 /
Liu, Yi 1 Juniper Lane Wayland, MA Massachusetts 01778 / US | 05 /
Cardolaccia, Thomas 28 Birch Street Needham, MA Massachusetts 02494 / US | 06 /
Bell, Rosemary 9 Valley View Road Wayland, MA Massachusetts 01778 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12157174.9 | 27.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | US201161447695P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447695 P | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492750 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039, G03F7/20 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
G03F7/2041 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0397 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/0392 (KR);
G03F7/091 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/11 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lichtbeständige Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zum Bilden von fotolithografischen Strukturen | [2012/35] | English: | Photoresist compositions and methods of forming photolithographic patterns | [2012/35] | French: | Compositions photorésistantes et procédés de formation de motifs photolithographiques | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010028804 (IWATO KAORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0192] , [0193] , [0220]; claims 1-12; table 2 *; | [A]US2009155718 (CHEN KUANG-JUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0027] , [0030]; examples 6,7 *; | [A]US2004197707 (YAMANAKA TSUKASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * pages 45-47, paragraphs 10,52,56,99; claims 1-8 * | by applicant | US6790579 |