EP2522396 - Combination therapy using an HDAC inhibitor and pemetrexed for treating lung or colon cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/46] | Combination therapies using HDAC inhibitors | ||
[2013/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TopoTarget UK Limited 7200 The Quorum, Suite 14 Oxford Business Park North Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2JZ / GB | [2013/52] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states TopoTarget UK Limited 7200 The Quorum, Suite 14 Oxford Business Park North Oxford OX4 2JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lichenstein, Henri BioPontis Alliance Suite 114-244 13200 Strickland Road Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 02 /
Jeffers, Mike Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals PO Box 1000 Montville, NJ 07045-1000 / US | 03 /
Xiaozhang, Qian Forest Laboratories Inc 1900 Plaza Five Jersey City, NJ 07311 / US | 04 /
Sehested, Maxwell TopoTarget A/S Symbion 3 Fruebjergvej DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | 05 /
Petersen, Kamille Dumong TopoTarget A/S Symbion 3 Fruebjergvej DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | 06 /
Ritchie, James TopoTarget UK Limited 7200 The Quorum, Suite 14 Oxford Business Park North Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2JZ / GB | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12157335.6 | 03.02.2006 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US20050649991P | 03.02.2005 Original published format: US 649991 P | US20050735662P | 10.11.2005 Original published format: US 735662 P | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522396 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61K31/519, A61K31/18 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/24 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/706, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2012/46] | A61P35/00, A61K31/00, A61K31/519, A61K31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Kombinationstherapie mit einem HDAC-Hemmer und Pemetrexed zur Behandlung von Lungen- oder Kolonkrebs | [2013/44] | English: | Combination therapy using an HDAC inhibitor and pemetrexed for treating lung or colon cancer | [2013/44] | French: | Polythérapie faisant appel à un inhibiteur d'HDAC et de pemetrexed pur le traitement du cancer du poumon ou du colon | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/46] | Kombinationstherapien mit HDAC-Hemmern | ||
Former [2012/46] | Combination therapies using HDAC inhibitors | ||
Former [2012/46] | Polythérapies faisant appel à des inhibiteurs d'HDAC | Examination procedure | 09.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 30.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06709637.0 / EP1855760 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060709637) is 18.02.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]WO2005018578 (ATON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-16 * claims 1,10 *; | [YP] - JACKIE WALLING, "From methotrexate to pemetrexed and beyond. A review of the pharmacodynamic and clinical properties of antifolates", INVESTIGATIONAL NEW DRUGS ; THE JOURNAL OF NEW ANTICANCER AGENTS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20060101), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10637-005-4541-1, ISSN 1573-0646, pages 37 - 77, XP019206128 [YP] 1-16 * page 39 * * page 60 - page 66 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10637-005-4541-1 | [A] - RITCHIE J ET AL, "THE HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITOR PXD101 SYNERGIES WITH ESTABLISHED CHEMOTHERAPEUTICS TO INHIBIT TUMOR CELL PROLIFERATION AND UPREGULATE APOPTOSIS IN VITRO", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20031201), vol. 9, no. 16, ISSN 1078-0432, XP001247019 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - MONNERET ET AL, "Histone deacetylase inhibitors", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 40, no. 1, ISSN 0223-5234, (20050101), pages 1 - 13, (20050101), XP027857598 [A] 1-16 * page 9, column 2, paragraph last * | [AP] - MORADEI O ET AL, "Histone deacetylase inhibitors: Latest developments, trends and prospects", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY - ANTI-CANCER AGENTS, NETHERLANDS, (200509), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1568-0118, pages 529 - 560, XP009065870 [AP] 1-16 * page 532, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568011054866946 | by applicant | - "Ovarian Cancer", Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, MCGRAW-HILL, (1994), pages 1853 - 1858 | - Cancer J. Clinicians, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY STATISTICS, (1995), vol. 45, page 30 | - "Cancer of the Lung: Cancer Screening and Early Detection", Cancer Medicine, B.C. DECKER INC. | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutically Acceptable Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | US20030381794 | US20030381790 | US20030381791 |