EP2605027 - A switch-extender and a method for calibrating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Thomas Salzmannstr. 104 81739 München / DE | 02 /
Holzmann, Gottfried Ingelsberger Weg 48 85604 Zorneding / DE | 03 /
Mittermaier, Werner Müllerstr. 48 85435 Erding / DE | 04 /
Plaumann, Ralf Kirchenstr. 2a 85659 Preisendorf / DE | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2013/25] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158439.5 | 07.03.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | US201161569352P | 12.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161569352 P | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605027 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2605027 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605027 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2605027 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R35/00, H03K17/00, G01R1/20, H04B3/46, H04L25/02, H04W24/06 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
G01R1/206 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (US);
G01R31/2889 (EP,US);
G01R35/005 (EP,US);
H04L25/0264 (US);
H04L25/028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/25] | G01R31/28, G01R35/00, H03K17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2018/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaltererweiterung und Kalibrierverfahren | [2013/25] | English: | A switch-extender and a method for calibrating | [2013/25] | French: | Rallonge d'interrupteur et procédé d'étalonnage | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5256964 (AHMED IMTIAZ K [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 19 *; | [XA]US2003043135 (CHIA CHOR-YIN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 2-17; | [AD]US2005264373 (BESSHO YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2008285637 (LIU JIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0056] * | by applicant | US2005264373 | US2009209249 |