EP2481723 - Substituted tetracycline compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paratek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Kneeland Street Boston, MA 02111 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12158471.8 | 18.03.2003 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | US20020367045P | 21.03.2002 Original published format: US 367045 P | US20020366915P | 21.03.2002 Original published format: US 366915 P | US20020367048P | 21.03.2002 Original published format: US 367048 P | US20020395468P | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 395468 P | US20030440305P | 14.01.2003 Original published format: US 440305 P | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2481723 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2481723 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/26, A61K31/65, A61P31/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
C07C237/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C239/18 (EP,US);
C07C251/08 (EP,US);
C07C251/48 (EP,US);
C07C255/25 (EP,US);
C07C255/43 (EP,US);
C07C255/58 (EP,US);
C07C255/59 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C271/44 (EP,US);
C07C275/34 (EP,US);
C07C279/18 (EP,US);
C07C281/14 (EP,US);
C07C309/61 (EP,US);
C07C311/19 (EP,US);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
C07C317/48 (EP,US);
C07C323/32 (EP,US);
C07C323/60 (EP,US);
C07C49/683 (KR);
C07C49/755 (KR);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/58 (EP,US);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/30 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D261/10 (EP,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,US);
C07D295/108 (EP,US);
C07D295/155 (EP,US);
C07D295/215 (EP,US);
C07D307/28 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D317/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Substituierte Tetracyclin-Verbindungen | [2012/31] | English: | Substituted tetracycline compounds | [2012/31] | French: | Composés de tétracycline substitués | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03714236.1 / EP1503981 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030714236) is 26.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0204407 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [I] 1,2,7-12,15 * claims 1, 4-6, 79-88; table 2; compounds CW, CX, EB, EC, FD, FT, GT, GU, HD * * page 27, lines 7-19 *; | [A]WO0204406 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7-12,15* claims 1, 66-74; table 1; compounds NS, PD * | by applicant | US2980584 | US2990331 | US3062717 | US3165531 | US3304227 | US3454697 | US3557280 | US3674859 | US3957980 | US4018889 | US4024272 | US4126680 | US4666897 | US4704383 | US4925833 | US4935412 | US5231017 | US5258371 | US5308839 | US5321017 | USRE34656E | US5459135 | US5523297 | US5532227 | US5668122 | US5770588 | US5773430 | US5789395 | US5827840 | US5834450 | US5834449 | US5837696 | US5843925 | US5919774 | US5919775 | US5929055 | US5977091 | US5998390 | US6015804 | US6043231 | US6043225 | US6100248 | US6231894 | US6277061 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - VAN DER BOZERT ET AL., CANCER RES., (1988), vol. 48, pages 6686 - 6690 | - LIEDTKE ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1998), vol. 44, pages 35 - 46 | - CHANDLER ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 72, pages 155 - 71 | - STETLER-STEVENSON ET AL., ANNU. REV. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 9, pages 541 - 73 | - TRYGGVASON ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1987), vol. 907, pages 191 - 217 | - LI ET AL., MOL. CARCINOG., (1998), vol. 22, pages 84 - 89 | - GREENWALD ET AL., BONE, (1998), vol. 22, pages 33 - 38 | - RYAN ET AL., CURR. OP. RHEUMATOL., (1996), vol. 8, pages 238 - 247 | - WAITZ, J.A., National Commission for Clinical Laboratoiy Standards, Document M7-A2, (1990), vol. 10, pages 13 - 20 | - J.MED.CHEM, (1988), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 577 - 82 | US20000216760 | US20000216659 | US20010275576 | US20010275620 | US20010275621 | US20010895812 | US20010895797 | US20010895857 |