EP2464172 - Scanning neighboring base stations in a wireless access system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/24] | Scanning neighboring base stations in wireless access system | ||
[2018/06] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/10] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong Ho 1503-1304, Hanireum-Hyun Dai APT. Sang-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si 420-816 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Cho, Ki Hyoung c/o LG Institute Hogye l(il)-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si 431-705 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158487.4 | 07.06.2005 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | KR20040041541 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: KR 20040041541 | KR20040046708 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: KR 20040046708 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2464172 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2464172 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0083 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Abtasten von benachbarten Basisstationen in einem drahtlosen Zugangssystem | [2012/24] | English: | Scanning neighboring base stations in a wireless access system | [2018/06] | French: | Balayage de stations de base voisines dans un système d'accès sans fil | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/24] | Scanning neighboring base stations in wireless access system | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 23.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05749466.8 / EP1759552 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050749466) is 21.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |