EP2485092 - Electrophotographic photosensitive body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd. 66-2, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8588 / JP | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Katsumi 4-5, Yashima-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima, 963-8802 / JP | 02 /
Takesue, Atsushi 4-5, Yashima-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima, 963-8802 / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Takehiro 4-5, Yashima-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima, 963-8802 / JP | 04 /
Koike, Makoto 4-5, Yashima-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima, 963-8802 / JP | 05 /
Nagai, Shinya 4-5, Yashima-machi Koriyama-shi Fukushima, 963-8802 / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158567.3 | 21.11.2005 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040337169 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004337169 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485092 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06, G03G5/05 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
G03G5/0564 (EP,US);
G03G5/06 (KR);
G03G5/102 (US);
G03G5/05 (KR);
G03G5/061446 (EP,KR,US);
G03G5/0679 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2012/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrofotografischer lichtempfindlicher Körper | [2012/32] | English: | Electrophotographic photosensitive body | [2012/32] | French: | Corps photosensible électro-photographique | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 05.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05809273.5 / EP1816522 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050809273) is 11.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004126685 (HORGAN ANTHONY M [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0030] , [0070] , [0071] , [0079] , [0082] , [0083]; example III; claims 1,5,9,21-24,29,3240,43,44,50,51 *; | [A]US4877702 (MIYAMOTO EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * examples 1,7,15 *; | [A]US4708922 (YOKOYA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 *column 7, compound 14*;; example 6 *; | [A]US4830944 (UMEHARA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * compound VI-3 *; column 67, line 68 *; | [Y]JP2001305764 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * Table 1, compound 2 *; | [A]JP2001356501 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0815877 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5213924 (SAKAMOTO SHUJI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPH086267 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPS62195667 (CANON KK) [A] 1-3 * page 3 - page 5 *; | [Y]JP2003107761 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * page 3 - page 5 *; | [Y]US4273846 (PAI DAMODAR M, et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 10 - line 51; claims 1-9 * | by applicant | JPS53132347 | JPS5395033 | JPS5422834 | JPS5412742 | JPS5417733 | JPS5421728 | JPS53133445 | JPS5417734 | JPS542129 | JPS53138229 | JPS57195767 | JPS57195768 | JPS57202545 | JPS59129857 | JPS62267363 | JPS6479753 | JPH0334503B | JPH0452459B | JP2004337169 | - Jikken Kagaku Koza, THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, pages 19,363 - 482 | - Jikken Kagaku Koza, THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, pages 20,279 - 318 |