EP2506679 - Luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamata, Masahiko TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 02 /
Takanashi, Kenji TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Sofia Ellinor Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2012/45] |
Former [2012/40] | Sander Jakobsson, Sofia Ellinor Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 12159338.8 | 13.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | JP20110072439 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011072439 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506679 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2506679 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B47/11 (US);
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | Leuchte | [2012/40] | English: | Luminaire | [2012/40] | French: | Luminaire | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 02.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2012 | AL | 13.11.2013 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | HR | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | RS | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | SM | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | NO | 13.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IE | 13.03.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | LU | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IE | 13.03.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | |
NO | 13.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005115058 (POLYBRITE INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 7, paragraph 34 - page 8, paragraph 38; figure 8 *; | [A]US2008018261 (KASTNER MARK A [US]) [A] 1-7* page 1, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 106; figures 20A-20D, 21C, 21F *; | [I]WO2008112820 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [I] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 21; figure 1 * * page 11, paragraph 52 - page 16, paragraph 63; figure 3 * * page 17, paragraph 66 - page 17, paragraph 67; figures 6A, 6B * |