EP2485514 - Self configuring and optimisation of cell neighbours in wireless telecommunications networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unwired Planet International Limited 70, Sir John Rogerson's Quay Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/23] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Unwired Planet, LLC 170 South Virginia Street, Suite 201 Reno, NV 89501 / US | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moe, Johan Ladusäter SE-590 17 MANTORP / SE | 02 /
Kallin, Harald Kruthornsvägen 40 SE-192 53 SOLLENTUNA / SE | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Seymour, James N., et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2012/32] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12159399.0 | 28.02.2007 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485514 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2485514 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00, H04J11/00 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
H04J11/0093 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04W16/00 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W36/0061 (US);
H04W36/00835 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | H04W16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | Selbstkonfiguration und Optimierung von Zellennachbarn in drahtlosen Telekommunikationsnetzwerken | [2012/32] | English: | Self configuring and optimisation of cell neighbours in wireless telecommunications networks | [2012/32] | French: | Configuration automatique et optimisation de cellules voisines dans des réseaux de télécommunications sans fil | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07711716.6 / EP2119287 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070711716) is 23.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | 02
17.09.2014
06.04.2020
WITHDRAWN Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Emmerling, Friedrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 06 80 80066 München / DE | 03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 04
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | 05
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | 06
18.09.2014
13.03.2017
WITHDRAWN LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Emmerling, Friedrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 06 80 80066 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
13.03.2017
WITHDRAWN LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
13.03.2017
WITHDRAWN LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
13.03.2017
WITHDRAWN LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
02.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
WITHDRAWN Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
28.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Jelf, Peter Myles Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Emmerling, Friedrich Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Boon, James Robert Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Emmerling, Friedrich Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
04
18.09.2014
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Seoul Headquarters Samsung Main Building 250-2 ga Taepyung-ro, Choong-gu Seoul / KR Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
05
18.09.2014
Samsung Electronics GmbH Am Kronberger Hang 6 65824 Schwalbach / DE Opponent's representative Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | |||
06
18.09.2014
LG Electronics Deutschland GmbH Berliner Strasse 93 40880 Ratingen / DE Opponent's representative Katérle, Axel, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.2014
Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US Opponent's representative Boon, James Robert Bristows LLP 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DH / GB | ||
02
17.09.2014
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Am Seestern 24 40547 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Emmerling, Friedrich Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
03
18.09.2014
HTC Germany GmbH Zeil 83 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 31.10.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.10.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/51] | Appeal following opposition | 13.11.2018 | Appeal received No. T2700/18 | 14.01.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 18.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2007 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | LU | 28.02.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.02.2007 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9638014 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO2005032190 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1720373 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |