EP2551450 - Device for creating a pressure differential for a fluid or multi-phase material system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Mommsenstrasse 13 01069 Dresden / DE | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunze, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Mühlenblick 20a 01157 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Stelmakh, Alexander Druzhkovsky, 6-A Apt. 42 Kiew-113, 033113 / UA | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159454.3 | 14.03.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | UA20110009336 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: UA 2011009336 | UA20110009337 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: UA 2011009337 | [2013/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2551450 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D1/36, F03B5/00, F04D5/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
F04D5/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Druckdifferenz für ein Fluid oder ein Mehrphasenstoffsystem | [2013/05] | English: | Device for creating a pressure differential for a fluid or multi-phase material system | [2013/05] | French: | Dispositif de production d'une différence de pression pour un fluide ou un système de matériau multiphase | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/05] | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2229287 (WORTHINGTON FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,3-10,13,14 * figures 1-7 * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 23 * [Y] 11,12; | [X]US3794447 (BULLOUGH W) [X] 1,3,8-10,13,14 * figures 1,8-12 * * column 4, line 57 - line 67 * * column 5, line 58 - line 62 * * column 6, line 3 - line 7 *; | [X]US3037457 (BENO STERNLICHT) [X] 1,3,8,9,13,14 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 33 - line 65 * * column 3, line 9 - line 20 *; | [X]DE2428932 (GLYCO METALL WERKE) [X] 1-3,13,14 * figures 1-6 * * page 4 - page 7 *; | [I]GB2140507 (NAT RES DEV) [I] 2,4-7 * figures 1-5 * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 56 *; | [Y]JP2004301225 (NSK LTD) [Y] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]US3650632 (SHANAHAN JOHN L) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |